Global patent index - EP 1062379 A1

EP 1062379 A1 2000-12-27 - SURFACE-TREATED ARTICLE OF MAGNESIUM OR MAGNESIUM ALLOYS, METHOD OF SURFACE PREPARATION AND METHOD OF COATING

Title (en)

SURFACE-TREATED ARTICLE OF MAGNESIUM OR MAGNESIUM ALLOYS, METHOD OF SURFACE PREPARATION AND METHOD OF COATING

Title (de)

OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDELTER ARTIKEL AUS MAGNESIUM ODER MAGNESIUMLEGIERUNGEN, VERFAHREN ZUR OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BESCHICHTEN

Title (fr)

ARTICLE EN MAGNESIUM OU EN ALLIAGE DE MAGNESIUM TRAITE EN SURFACE, PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE SURFACE ET PROCEDE DE REVETEMENT

Publication

EP 1062379 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99907943 A

Priority

  • JP 9901275 W
  • JP 6711698 A
  • JP 2495699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6409844B1] An article of magnesium or its alloy having a surface layer containing magnesium condensed phosphate and magnesium phosphate, which can be produced by treating an article of magnesium or its alloy with a treating liquid containing 1,000 to 20,000 ppm of alkaline metal ions, 1,000 to 50,000 ppm of condensed phosphate ions, and 100 to 20,000 ppm of borate ions, and having pH of at least 8. The treated article has good corrosion resistance, and a coating can be formed on the surface of the article with good adhesion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 22/60; C23C 22/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/07 (2006.01); C23C 22/23 (2006.01); C23C 22/57 (2006.01); C23C 22/60 (2006.01); C23F 1/40 (2006.01); C23G 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/60 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947729A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 6409844 B1 20020625; BR 9908778 A 20001114; CN 1140652 C 20040303; CN 1302341 A 20010704; DE 69902151 D1 20020822; DE 69902151 T2 20030313; EP 1062379 A1 20001227; EP 1062379 B1 20020717; JP H11323571 A 19991126; MY 119942 A 20050830; RU 2221081 C2 20040110; WO 9947729 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090316

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090316

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090316

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060315

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080313

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080311

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080312

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070308

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070528

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070308

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060308

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030422

2002-10-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69902151

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-22

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-07-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011009

2001-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT