Global patent index - EP 1062397 A1

EP 1062397 A1 2000-12-27 - DOUBLE SHEET METAL CONSISTING OF TWO COVERING METAL SHEETS AND AN INTERMEDIATE LAYER

Title (en)

DOUBLE SHEET METAL CONSISTING OF TWO COVERING METAL SHEETS AND AN INTERMEDIATE LAYER

Title (de)

DOPPELLAGENBLECH AUS ZWEI DECKBLECHEN UND EINER ZWISCHENLAGE

Title (fr)

TOLE DOUBLE CONSTITUEE DE DEUX TOLES DE COUVERTURE ET D'UNE COUCHE INTERMEDIAIRE

Publication

EP 1062397 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99915552 A

Priority

  • DE 19810706 A
  • EP 9901513 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19810706A1] A double-walled, filled panel comprising sheets bonded together at points of indentation, includes both closed-cell plastic foam and harder particles of e.g. glass, ceramic or metal. The behavior of the filling when the sheets are pressed together is characterized by two stress/strain curves. An Independent claim is also included for the corresponding method of making the filled double panel. Preferred features: The filling is adhered to the sheets over its entire area. On pressing together, resilient displacement takes place in accordance with the softer stress/strain curve, over 2-8% of the filling thickness. The corresponding modulus of elasticity is less than 50 MPa. That corresponding with the harder curve, is 500-210,000 MPa. The filling is porous plastic. It contains embedded particles of material, corresponding with the harder curve. The filler modulus of elasticity, excluding embedded particles, is less than 20 MPa. The filling has closed pores, occupying up to 70% of its volume. The hard embedded particles occupy up to 10% of the volume, or up to 5% of the weight of the double-layered sheets. They are glass, ceramic or metal and their extent perpendicular to the sheets, is 2-8% less than the sheet spacing. Mutual spacing of all hard particles in the cross sectional plane of the sheet is 3-7 times the inter-sheet spacing. The hard bodies are hollow, curved cuttings, foam, irregular granules or cenospheres. The plastic for the filler cures under heating to a viscous state, hardening fully at temperatures of 150-230 deg C.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 2/32; E04C 2/292

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/292 (2006.01); E04C 2/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/292 (2013.01); E04C 2/326 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12347 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12389 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12569 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9946461A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19810706 A1 19990916; DE 19810706 C2 20020912; EP 1062397 A1 20001227; EP 1062397 B1 20030521; US 6428905 B1 20020806; WO 9946461 A1 19990916

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-03-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040309

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905644

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB