Global Patent Index - EP 1062400 A1

EP 1062400 A1 2000-12-27 - DEVICE FOR INTRODUCING OR TRANSMITTING FORCES AND/OR BENDING MOMENTS INTO THE BAR OF A BAR-TYPE SUPPORTING FRAME AND BAR-TYPE SUPPORTING FRAME HAVING SUCH A DEVICE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR INTRODUCING OR TRANSMITTING FORCES AND/OR BENDING MOMENTS INTO THE BAR OF A BAR-TYPE SUPPORTING FRAME AND BAR-TYPE SUPPORTING FRAME HAVING SUCH A DEVICE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR EIN- ODER ÜBERLEITUNG VON KRÄFTEN UND/ODER BIEGEMOMENTEN IN DEN STAB EINES STABTRAGWERKES UND MIT EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG AUSGERÜSTETES STABTRAGWERK

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR L'INTRODUCTION OU LA TRANSMISSION DE FORCES OU DE MOMENTS DE FLEXION DANS LA BARRE D'UNE STRUCTURE PORTEUSE ET STRUCTURE PORTEUSE EQUIPEE D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 1062400 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99913114 A

Priority

  • DE 9900661 W
  • DE 19811619 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19811619A1] The invention relates to a device for introducing or transmitting forces and/or bending moments into the bar of a bar-type supporting frame and to a bar-type supporting frame (1) which has such a device. Said device comprises at least one metal sleeve (4, 5) which is resistant to bending, adjusted to the shape of the bar cross-section and can be attached to the bar with a non-positive fit by way of an intermediate layer in the form of a self-adhesive coat (9). The sleeve has at least one connecting means (6, 7) on its outer circumference at the level of which the forces and/or bending moments can be introduced. According to a preferred version of the invention the sleeve comprises a closed load-carrying ring which can be pulled over the bar. The sleeves attached to the bar are also used for fixing an external earth connection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 12/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 12/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 12/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947771A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19811619 A1 19990930; AT 222985 T 20020915; CA 2324111 A1 19990923; EP 1062400 A1 20001227; EP 1062400 B1 20020828; WO 9947771 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120310

2013-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120310

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120310

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 222985 T

- Effective date: 20120310

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120310

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120311

2012-10-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-10-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121001

2012-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20120331

2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902467

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110330

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110414

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110310

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110209

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110308

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110315

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110321

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100608

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100521

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902467 20021002

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 222985 T 20020915

2002-01-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BAR-TYPE SUPPORTING

2002-01-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BAR-TYPE SUPPORTING

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010621

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE