Global patent index - EP 1062402 A2

EP 1062402 A2 2000-12-27 - CABLE ACTUATED WINDOW LIFT DRIVE MECHANISM

Title (en)

CABLE ACTUATED WINDOW LIFT DRIVE MECHANISM

Title (de)

SEILFENSTERHEBERANTRIEB

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE LEVE-VITRE PAR CABLE

Publication

EP 1062402 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99924662 A

Priority

  • DE 9900821 W
  • DE 19812875 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19812875C1] The invention relates to a cable actuated window lift drive mechanism which can be secured to a sheet metal support. The inventive device comprises a motor shaft which accommodates a cable drum and a gear element, in addition to two bearing covers placed on both sides of the sheet metal support. The aim of the invention is to provide a compact window lift drive mechanism which is easy to assemble and is made up of only a few components with modest tolerance requirements when compared to the degree of manufacturing precision. In order to achieve this task, the motor shaft (9) is integrated into the one of the bearing covers (6a, 6b), the position of the bearing covers (6a, 6b) in relation to each other on the sheet metal support can be fixed with respect to the motor shaft (9) by means of fixtures (8) and the periphery of the cable drum (4) and/or gear element (5) is sealed (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/16; B60J 1/17; E05F 11/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/48 (2006.01); E05F 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/483 (2013.01); E05F 15/697 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/726 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/12 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947779A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19812875 C1 19990602; BR 9908853 A 20001121; EP 1062402 A2 20001227; EP 1062402 B1 20020814; WO 9947779 A2 19990923; WO 9947779 A3 19991223

INPADOC legal status

2003-11-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-03-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030317

2003-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902342

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-19

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-08-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-08-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020814

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010607

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000911

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE