Global patent index - EP 1062417 A1

EP 1062417 A1 2000-12-27 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'EXPLOITATION D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1062417 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00902542 A

Priority

  • DE 0000051 W
  • DE 19900740 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19900740A1] The invention relates to a method and to a device for operating an internal combustion engine which is operated with a lean air/fuel mixture in at least one operational state. To this end, the fuel amount to be injected and/or the injection time to be output is determined on the basis of a reference value. In order to monitor the functionality, the actual torque of the internal combustion engine is determined on the basis of the fuel amount to be injected and/or the injection time to be output. Said actual torque is compared with a maximally permissible torque and an error reaction is initiated if the actual torque exceeds the maximally permissible value. Simultaneously, a value representing the oxygen concentration in the effluents is compared with at least one predetermined threshold value and an error reaction is initiated if said oxygen concentration exceeds said threshold value.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/22; F02D 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3023 (2013.01); F02D 41/1497 (2013.01); F02D 41/22 (2013.01); F02D 2200/1004 (2013.01); F02D 2250/18 (2013.01); F02D 2250/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0042307A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19900740 A1 20000713; EP 1062417 A1 20001227; EP 1062417 B1 20040915; JP 2002535533 A 20021022; JP 4338900 B2 20091007; RU 2239078 C2 20041027; US 6386180 B1 20020514; WO 0042307 A1 20000720

INPADOC legal status

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150108

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150930

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50007735

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140127

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140124

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140325

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130207

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007735

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030603

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010122

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE