Global Patent Index - EP 1062419 A1

EP 1062419 A1 2000-12-27 - DEVICE FOR RECIRCULATING EXHAUST GASES IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR RECIRCULATING EXHAUST GASES IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR RÜCKFÜHRUNG VON ABGASEN BEI EINEM VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LE RECYCLAGE DES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT DANS UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1062419 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99910219 A

Priority

  • DE 19809861 A
  • EP 9900896 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19809861A1] The invention relates to a device for recirculating exhaust gases in an internal combustion engine, in which a predefinable quantity of recirculated exhaust gas is introduced into the inlet port of the internal combustion engine in the direction of flow downstream of a throttle valve (2). A valve (8), for example a fixed-cycle valve, inserted into the exhaust-gas recirculating line (5) allows the passage of exhaust gas or fresh air at a predetermined cycle/quantity ratio, thereby producing an air-exhaust gas mixture to be introduced into the inlet port.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/07 (2006.01); F02M 35/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/108 (2013.01); F02M 26/22 (2016.02); F02M 26/28 (2016.02); F02M 26/36 (2016.02); F02M 35/10222 (2013.01); F02M 35/1038 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9945265A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19809861 A1 19990909; BR 9908794 A 20001031; EP 1062419 A1 20001227; EP 1062419 B1 20020410; JP 2002506160 A 20020226; US 6422218 B1 20020723; WO 9945265 A1 19990910

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2006-02-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030113

2003-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-01-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2002-07-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901189

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-16

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT SE

2002-04-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-04-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020410

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010726

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT SE