Global patent index - EP 1062421 A1

EP 1062421 A1 2000-12-27 - FUEL INJECTOR

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTOR

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1062421 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99955826 A

Priority

  • DE 9903157 W
  • DE 19900406 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19900406A1] The invention relates to a fuel injector for fuel injection systems of internal combustion engines. Said fuel injector comprises an electromagnetic actuating element with a magnet coil (1), a tubular inner pole (2) and an outer magnetic circuit component (5), a thin-walled valve sleeve (6) having an inner opening (11) and a mobile valve closing body (19) which cooperates with a valve seat (16) which is assigned to a valve seat body (15). The valve seat body (15) and inner pole (2) are fixedly positioned in the inner opening (11) of the valve sleeve (6). The inner pole (2) has a longitudinal slit (63) which is formed by the production of said pole by rolling or bending.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 51/06; F02M 61/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/168 (2013.01); F02M 51/061 (2013.01); F02M 51/0671 (2013.01); Y10S 239/90 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49433 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0040855A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19900406 A1 20000713; DE 59914674 D1 20080417; EP 1062421 A1 20001227; EP 1062421 B1 20080305; JP 2002534638 A 20021015; JP 4597376 B2 20101215; US 6679435 B1 20040120; WO 0040855 A1 20000713

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59914674

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141208

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131029

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091110

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20081208

2008-11-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2008-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914674

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-04-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-03-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010115

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE