Global Patent Index - EP 1062426 A2

EP 1062426 A2 2000-12-27 - RADIAL PISTON ENGINE WITH GUIDE ROLLERS

Title (en)

RADIAL PISTON ENGINE WITH GUIDE ROLLERS

Title (de)

RADIALKOLBENMOTOR MIT ROLLENFÜHRUNG

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A PISTONS RADIAUX AVEC GUIDAGE DES GALETS

Publication

EP 1062426 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99915563 A

Priority

  • DE 19810372 A
  • EP 9901551 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19810372A1] A radial engine has a rotating cylinder block with radial pistons which interact with an outer cam ring via rollers. Each roller is fitted into the end of its piston and moves with the piston. A groove in the piston end locates the roller while the mountings are held in the sides of the piston without contacting the cam.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F03C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F03C 1/04 (2006.01); F04B 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/0439 (2013.01); F03C 1/0428 (2013.01); F04B 1/0408 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9946504A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19810372 A1 19990916; EP 1062426 A2 20001227; EP 1062426 B1 20021002; JP 2002506172 A 20020226; US 6494127 B1 20021217; WO 9946504 A2 19990916; WO 9946504 A3 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090310

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090310

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090310

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080318

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030115

2002-12-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BOSCH REXROTH AG

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902931 20021107

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010913

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT