Global Patent Index - EP 1062449 A1

EP 1062449 A1 2000-12-27 - DETECTABLE SYNTHETIC CONDUIT AND CONNECTING MEANS THEREOF

Title (en)

DETECTABLE SYNTHETIC CONDUIT AND CONNECTING MEANS THEREOF

Title (de)

DETEKTIERBARE KUNSTSTOFF-ROHRLEITUNG UND IHRE VERBINDUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

CONDUIT DETECTABLE EN MATIERE SYNTHETIQUE ET SES MOYENS DE RACCORDEMENT

Publication

EP 1062449 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99909000 A

Priority

  • FR 9900532 W
  • FR 9803209 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2776135A1] The conduit consists of a sheath (2) enclosing a channel (3) which may carry cables or optical fibres. The sheath includes a continuous cavity (5) which houses an insulated conductor (4,4a) used to provide electromagnetic detection when the conduit is buried. Each section of conduit has an end section (60) which uses internal channels (64,66) to compensate for any angular displacement between conduit sections

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16L 1/11; F16L 9/12; F16L 9/18; F16L 9/19; F16L 11/118; F16L 11/127; F16L 11/20; F16L 11/22; F16L 41/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16L 1/11 (2006.01); F16L 9/18 (2006.01); G01V 15/00 (2006.01); H02G 3/04 (2006.01); H02G 9/00 (2006.01); H02G 9/02 (2006.01); H02G 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16L 9/18 (2013.01); F16L 1/11 (2013.01); G01V 15/00 (2013.01); H02G 3/0481 (2013.01); H02G 9/00 (2013.01); H02G 9/02 (2013.01); H02G 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9946529A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2776135 A1 19990917; FR 2776135 B1 20000519; AU 2839799 A 19990927; BR 9904767 A 20000308; CA 2321880 A1 19990916; EP 1062449 A1 20001227; NO 20004444 A 20000906; NO 20004444 D0 20000906; PL 336158 A1 20000605; SE 0003174 D0 20000907; SE 0003174 L 20000907; SE 515211 C2 20010625; WO 9946529 A1 19990916

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-17 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-05-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DETECTABLE SYNTHETIC CONDUIT, MANUFACTURING PROCESS AND ASSEMBLY USING THE SAME

2001-06-06 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NOVOPLASTIC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVOPLASTIC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000919

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000919;LT PAYMENT 20000919;LV PAYMENT 20000919;MK PAYMENT 20000919;RO PAYMENT 20000919;SI PAYMENT 20000919