Global Patent Index - EP 1062450 A1

EP 1062450 A1 2000-12-27 - INSULATED DRINKING STRAW FOR HOT AND COLD LIQUIDS

Title (en)

INSULATED DRINKING STRAW FOR HOT AND COLD LIQUIDS

Title (de)

ISOLIERTER TRINKSTROHHALM FÜR HEISSE UND KALTE FLÜSSIGKEITEN

Title (fr)

PAILLE ISOLEE POUR LIQUIDES CHAUDS OU FROIDS

Publication

EP 1062450 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99956964 A

Priority

  • US 9926365 W
  • US 18996898 A
  • US 42048099 A
  • US 43362799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0028248A1] An insulated drinking straw (10) and an insulating member (12) for use in drinking hot and cold liquids, such as those consumed from a cup or other container. The insulated drinking straw comprises an inner tubular member (11) and an outer insulating member (13) disposed around a portion of the periphery of the inner tubular member. The insulating member may be used as a separate device. In one embodiment of the insulating member, the insulating member has an inner shaft, an outer shaft connected to the inner shaft such that an air space is formed between the shafts, and a slot is formed in the insulating member between the inner and outer shafts. In another embodiment of the insulating member, the insulating member has an outer shaft, a compressible insulating material having an inner opening that is attached to an inner wall of the outer shaft, and a slot is formed in the compressible insulating material and outer shaft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16L 9/14; A47G 21/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 21/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 21/187 (2013.01); A47G 21/186 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0028248 A1 20000518; EP 1062450 A1 20001227; EP 1062450 A4 20030326

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-17 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20100704

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040914

2003-03-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030206

2002-10-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 16L 9/14 A, 7A 47G 21/18 B, 7F 16L 59/02 B

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE