Global Patent Index - EP 1062461 A1

EP 1062461 A1 2000-12-27 - COMBUSTION CHAMBER AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A COMBUSTION CHAMBER

Title (en)

COMBUSTION CHAMBER AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A COMBUSTION CHAMBER

Title (de)

BRENNKAMMER UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER BRENNKAMMER

Title (fr)

CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION ET MODE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION

Publication

EP 1062461 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99913091 A

Priority

  • DE 9900513 W
  • DE 19810276 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9946540A1] The invention relates to a combustion chamber (1), comprising an inner lining (5) made up of a number of heat shielding elements (6). At least one heat-shielding element (5) which acts as a burner is a burner-heat shielding element (22) upstream of which a supply (30) of fuel (36) and a supply (26) of combustion air (38) are connected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/28; F23D 14/16; F23R 3/00; F23R 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/16 (2006.01); F23R 3/00 (2006.01); F23R 3/28 (2006.01); F23R 3/34 (2006.01); F23R 3/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/16 (2013.01); F23R 3/002 (2013.01); F23R 3/007 (2013.01); F23R 3/286 (2013.01); F23R 3/346 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9946540A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9946540 A1 19990916; EP 1062461 A1 20001227; EP 1062461 B1 20031203; JP 2002506193 A 20020226; JP 4365027 B2 20091118

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140225

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140225

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-11-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907940

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140225

2014-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907940

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130510

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130419

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130213

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130301

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100225

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-09-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907940 P 20040115

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SERVOPATENT GMBH

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI