Global Patent Index - EP 1062600 A2

EP 1062600 A2 2000-12-27 - IMPROVEMENTS IN, OR RELATING TO, TELECOMMUNICATIONS TRANSMISSION SYSTEMS

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS IN, OR RELATING TO, TELECOMMUNICATIONS TRANSMISSION SYSTEMS

Title (de)

VERBESSERUNGEN VON ODER IN BEZUG AUF TELEKOMMUNIKATIONS-ÜBERTRAGUNGS-SYSTEME

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES AUX SYSTEMES DE TRANSMISSION DES TELECOMMUNICATIONS OU SE RAPPORTANT A CES SYSTEMES

Publication

EP 1062600 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99913788 A

Priority

  • SE 9900354 W
  • SE 9800802 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9946700A2] The invention provides a telecommunications transmission system adapted to operate as a platform for an agent-based electronic market and including a plurality of user terminals arranged for connection to the Internet, at least one service provider server, and a plurality of electronic shops. The platform is arranged to support agent-based market interactions between a plurality of agent types, and the system is adapted to synchronize a real-time session for a user on an agent-enabled web-site with communications between agents of said user and said web-site using duel session identification.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9946700A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9946700 A2 19990916; WO 9946700 A3 19991202; EE 04826 B1 20070416; EE 200000516 A 20020215; EP 1062600 A2 20001227; NO 20004381 A 20001110; NO 20004381 D0 20000904; NO 318708 B1 20050425; SE 512107 C2 20000124; SE 9800802 D0 19980310; SE 9800802 L 19990911

INPADOC legal status


2015-06-10 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-02-02 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2007-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TELIASONERA AB

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061027

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20001010;LV PAYMENT 20001010