Global Patent Index - EP 1062647 A1

EP 1062647 A1 2000-12-27 - FIRE ALARM BOX

Title (en)

FIRE ALARM BOX

Title (de)

BRANDMELDER

Title (fr)

AVERTISSEUR D'INCENDIE

Publication

EP 1062647 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98952572 A

Priority

  • DE 9802750 W
  • DE 19809896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19809896A1] The invention relates to a fire alarm call box for detecting gaseous and powdery combustion products, comprising at least one optical transmitter and at least two optical receivers, each for sending an electrical signal to an evaluation unit connected downstream. At least one of said optical receivers (28) is located beyond a direct range of radiation (8) of the optical transmitter (2) and acts as a scattered light receiver. At least one other optical receiver (4) is located within the direct range of radiation (8) of the optical transmitter (2). A gas sensitive layer (18) is connected upstream of this optical receiver (4). Upon contact with a specific gas, said layer preferably absorbs light components of a certain narrow wavelength range.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 17/103; G08B 17/107

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/75 (2006.01); G01N 21/27 (2006.01); G01N 21/49 (2006.01); G01N 21/53 (2006.01); G08B 17/103 (2006.01); G08B 17/107 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 17/107 (2013.01); G08B 17/113 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9945515A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19809896 A1 19990909; EP 1062647 A1 20001227; EP 1062647 B1 20020821; ES 2182366 T3 20030301; JP 2002506261 A 20020226; JP 3864048 B2 20061227; US 6479833 B1 20021112; WO 9945515 A1 19990910

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080531

2006-09-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182366 T3

2003-02-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805266 20020926

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-08-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011129

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001009

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI