Global patent index - EP 1062651 A1

EP 1062651 A1 2000-12-27 - METHOD FOR DISPLAY MATRIX DISPLAY SCREEN WITH ALTERNATING SCANNING CONTROL IN ADJACENT GROUPS OF COLUMNS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DISPLAY MATRIX DISPLAY SCREEN WITH ALTERNATING SCANNING CONTROL IN ADJACENT GROUPS OF COLUMNS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR DATENANZEIGE AUF EINER MATRIXANZEIGE MIT ALTERNIERENDER ABTASTSEQUENZ IN BENACHBARTEN SPALTENGRUPPEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'AFFICHAGE DE DONNEES SUR AFFICHEUR MATRICIEL AVEC ORDRE DE BALAYAGE ALTERNE EN GROUPES ADJACENTES DE COLOMNES

Publication

EP 1062651 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99907671 A

Priority

  • FR 9900524 W
  • FR 9802919 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2776107A1] the system uses alternate direction scanning of lines.- DETAILED DESCRIPTION - The method for displaying data on a matrix display screen uses N data lines (C1, C2, C3...) and P selection lines (L1, L2, L3...) at the intersection of which are located the picture elements or pixels (2). The N data lines are assembled in P blocks (1) of N' lines (1 - Cg), with N=P x N'. Each block (1) receives in parallel one of the P' data signals (DB1, ...) which is demultiplexed (DW1, DW2... DW9) on the block N' lines. The scanning of N' data lines is effected from 1 to N', or from N' to 1 alternately along the selection lines

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/3611 (2013.01); G09G 3/20 (2013.01); G09G 2310/0245 (2013.01); G09G 2310/0283 (2013.01); G09G 2310/0297 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0209 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9946753A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2776107 A1 19990917; DE 69902015 D1 20020808; DE 69902015 T2 20030306; EP 1062651 A1 20001227; EP 1062651 B1 20020703; JP 2002507007 A 20020305; JP 4727038 B2 20110720; US 6924785 B1 20050802; WO 9946753 A1 19990916

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160310

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2007-03-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070301

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030404

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020721

2002-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69902015

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-08

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES AVIONICS LCD S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011017

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL