Global Patent Index - EP 1062657 A2

EP 1062657 A2 2000-12-27 - A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING SPLIT VECTOR QUANTIZATION DATA CODING

Title (en)

A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING SPLIT VECTOR QUANTIZATION DATA CODING

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEREITSTELLEN VON VEKTOR-SEGMENTEN QUANTIFIKATIONS-DATENKODIERUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE CODAGE DE DONNEES PAR QUANTIFICATION DE VECTEURS SEGMENTES

Publication

EP 1062657 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99905742 A

Priority

  • US 9902431 W
  • US 2243798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9941736A2] A method and system for providing split vector quantization for use in determining constrained ordered set values, such as line spectrum pair parameters to determine spectral parameters in a data compression system, utilizes multiple codebooks (22a-22c) containing delta coded constrained ordered set values that are normalized to an upper and lower bound. An LSP reconstructor (34) reconstructs received spectral parameters to decode data, such as speech, based on the normalized delta quantization data of line spectrum pair parameters obtained from the split vector reconstruction codebooks (22a-22c). The LSP reconstructor (34) dynamically generates line spectrum pair parameters based on the normalized delta quantization data. In another embodiment, instead of storing the absolute value of the line spectrum pair parameters in segmented codebooks, the combination of at least two absolute value vectors and at least one normalized delta quantization vector is used for spectral quantization.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 3/00; G10L 19/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/04 (2006.01); G10L 19/06 (2006.01); G10L 19/12 (2006.01); H03M 7/30 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

G10L (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/04 (2013.01); G10L 19/06 (2013.01); G10L 19/12 (2013.01); H03M 7/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9941736 A2 19990819; WO 9941736 A3 19991021; EP 1062657 A2 20001227; EP 1062657 A4 20041006; JP 2002503834 A 20020205

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20041016

2004-10-06 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 10L 3/00 A

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 10L 19/06 B

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ASHLEY, JAMES, PATRICK

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PENG, WEIMIN

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JASIUK, MARK, A.

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SMITH, AARON, M.

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ASHLEY, JAMES, PATRICK

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PENG, WEIMIN

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JASIUK, MARK, A.

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SMITH, AARON, M.

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB