Global patent index - EP 1062659 A1

EP 1062659 A1 2000-12-27 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PROCESSING A SOUND SIGNAL

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PROCESSING A SOUND SIGNAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEARBEITUNG EINES TONSIGNALS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR TRAITER UN SIGNAL ACOUSTIQUE

Publication

EP 1062659 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99917771 A

Priority

  • DE 9900615 W
  • DE 19812207 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9948084A1] The invention relates to a method and device for processing a sound signal comprising a useful signal and an interfering signal. The sound signal is transformed in the frequency range and a modification in the shape of the signal is represented by an envelope for at least one frequency over a given time period. By segmenting the envelope it is possible to obtain a maximum for each segment. The lowest maximum is weighted by a factor and is extracted from the sound signal. It is also possible to take the minimum into account in order to reduce the interfering signal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 15/20 (2006.01); G10L 13/00 (2006.01); G10L 15/02 (2006.01); G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); G10L 25/27 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); G10L 25/27 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948084A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9948084 A1 19990923; EP 1062659 A1 20001227; EP 1062659 B1 20020130; JP 2002507775 A 20020312; JP 4276781 B2 20090610; US 6804646 B1 20041012

INPADOC legal status

2016-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150308

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150308

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59900797

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59900797

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140312

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130408

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2003-01-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-07-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020407

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900797

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-14

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 10L 21/02 A

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010212

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB