Global patent index - EP 1062663 A1

EP 1062663 A1 2000-12-27 - OPTICAL PICKUP DEVICE

Title (en)

OPTICAL PICKUP DEVICE

Title (de)

OPTISCHE ABTASTVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME OPTIQUE DE SAISIE

Publication

EP 1062663 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99907875 A

Priority

  • JP 9901090 W
  • JP 7644098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9946767A1] Data can be read at high speed from an optical disk (20) by using a plurality of light spots, and data can be written in the optical disk (20) by using a single light spot without any practical problem. In reading data from the optical disk (20), a diffraction grating (13) is inserted between a semiconductor laser (12) and an objective lens (15). A laser beam from the semiconductor laser (12) is diffracted by the diffraction grating (13) to generate diffracted light beams (16b, 16c) and form a plurality of light spots (32a, 32b, 32c) on a plurality of tracks (3) of the optical disk (20). In writing data in the optical disk (20), the diffraction grating (13) is exited from between the semiconductor laser (12) and objective lens (20). Only a non-diffracted light beam (16a) is incident upon the objective lens (15) to form a single light spot (32a) on the optical disk (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 7/125; G11B 7/00; G11B 7/135; G11B 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/135 (2012.01); G11B 7/0045 (2006.01); G11B 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/1365 (2013.01); G11B 7/1353 (2013.01); G11B 7/1369 (2013.01); G11B 7/1381 (2013.01); G11B 7/0045 (2013.01); G11B 7/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9946767A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9946767 A1 19990916; CN 1292917 A 20010425; DE 1062663 T1 20010705; EP 1062663 A1 20001227; TW 548643 B 20030821

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021029

2002-01-25 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

2001-07-05 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2001-04-02 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCNL

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010117

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL