Global Patent Index - EP 1062673 A1

EP 1062673 A1 2000-12-27 - ELECTRIC SWITCH

Title (en)

ELECTRIC SWITCH

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER SCHALTER

Title (fr)

COMMUTATEUR ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1062673 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99919052 A

Priority

  • DE 9900636 W
  • DE 19810332 A
  • DE 19855263 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19909854A1] The switch has an actuation part (5) movable from an initial position to an operating position, in which it switches a contact system, adjusts a potentiometer or similar, and a movable actuation element (13) which acts on a first device when moved. The actuation element is mounted immediately adjacent to the actuation part and a second device can be actuated by the actuation element. The actuation element is moved in one direction (6) to operate the first device and in a different direction to operate the second device. It can operate a changeover switch for a reversible electric motor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/063 (2013.01); B25D 2250/261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9946787A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19909854 A1 19990916; EP 1062673 A1 20001227; EP 1062673 B1 20020109; US 6489578 B1 20021203; WO 9946787 A1 19990916

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-03-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900748

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-28

2002-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI NL

2002-01-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020109

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI NL