Global Patent Index - EP 1062700 A1

EP 1062700 A1 2000-12-27 - POWER SEMICONDUCTOR STRUCTURAL PART WITH A MESA EDGE

Title (en)

POWER SEMICONDUCTOR STRUCTURAL PART WITH A MESA EDGE

Title (de)

LEISTUNGSHALBLEITERBAUELEMENT MIT MESA-RANDABSCHLUSS

Title (fr)

COMPOSANT A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR DE PUISSANCE A BORD MESA

Publication

EP 1062700 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00903516 A

Priority

  • DE 0000086 W
  • DE 19900808 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0042662A1] The invention relates to an asymmetrically-locking power semiconductor structural part. Field stop zones of the same conducting type as in the inner zone are provided in the border area underneath the areas which are etched out (etching shoulders) from the semiconductor body. Said field stop zones are typically connected to the inner zone and to the emitter zone and are adjacent the polish-etched, damage-free surface of the etched-out etching shoulders. The doping concentration of said field stop zones is adjusted in such a way that a decreasing gradient results in the concentration gradient of the doping. Said decreasing gradient extends from the surface of the etching shoulders to the depth of the semiconductor body. According to the invention, the volume breakdown voltage can be secured under extreme conditions even in the bordering area of the power semiconductor structural part. The present invention is especially useful for power semiconductor structural parts which are embodied in a mesa structure, especially in pin diodes, asymmetric thyristors as for example GTOs, IGBTs and the like.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 29/06; H01L 29/739; H01L 29/744; H01L 29/868

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 29/744 (2006.01); H01L 21/329 (2006.01); H01L 29/06 (2006.01); H01L 29/739 (2006.01); H01L 29/78 (2006.01); H01L 29/861 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 29/0661 (2013.01); H01L 29/0615 (2013.01); H01L 29/7396 (2013.01); H01L 29/744 (2013.01); H01L 29/8613 (2013.01); H01L 29/0834 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0042662A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0042662 A1 20000720; EP 1062700 A1 20001227; JP 2002535840 A 20021022; US 6696705 B1 20040224

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081231

2007-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070226

2006-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE