Global Patent Index - EP 1062710 A1

EP 1062710 A1 2000-12-27 - SUBSTRATE ANTENNA

Title (en)

SUBSTRATE ANTENNA

Title (de)

SUBSTRATANTENNE

Title (fr)

ANTENNE DE SUBSTRAT

Publication

EP 1062710 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99934369 A

Priority

  • US 9903505 W
  • US 7561598 P
  • US 2851098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9943039A1] A substrate antenna (400) that includes one or more conductive traces (402) supported on a dielectric substrate (404) having a predetermined thickness. Appropriate dimensions are selected for the lengths and widths of traces, based on the wavelength of interest, connecting elements, and space allocated. The supporting substrate (404) is mounted offset from and generally perpendicular to the ground plane (502) associated with the device with which the antenna is being used. The trace is electrically connected to a conductive pad (408) on one end. A signal feed (410) for the antenna is coupled to the conductive pad (408). The substrate antenna employs a very thin and compact structure which provides appropriate bandwidth. Antenna compactness and a greater variety of useful shapes allow the substrate antenna to be used very efficentiyl as an internal antenna for wireless devices.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/24; H01Q 1/38; H01Q 9/40; H01Q 9/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/38 (2006.01); H01Q 9/40 (2006.01); H01Q 9/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/42 (2013.01); H01Q 1/243 (2013.01); H01Q 1/38 (2013.01); H01Q 9/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943039A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9943039 A1 19990826; AR 018291 A1 20011114; AU 3299899 A 19990906; AU 748232 B2 20020530; BR 9908051 A 20020115; BR MU7903455 Y1 20170314; CA 2321214 A1 19990826; CA 2321214 C 20080219; CN 1168175 C 20040922; CN 1296647 A 20010523; EP 1062710 A1 20001227; IL 137933 A 20060410; IL 137933 D0 20011031; JP 2002504767 A 20020212; JP 2009055617 A 20090312; JP 2011205678 A 20111013; JP 5345653 B2 20131120

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-28 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1034003

2005-07-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050118

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040705

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: QUALCOMM INCORPORATED

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE