Global Patent Index - EP 1062842 A1

EP 1062842 A1 2000-12-27 - COMBINATION OVEN WITH MANUAL ENTRY OF CONTROL ALGORITHMS

Title (en)

COMBINATION OVEN WITH MANUAL ENTRY OF CONTROL ALGORITHMS

Title (de)

KOMBINIERTER OFEN MIT MANUALER EINFÜHRUNG VON REGELUNGSALGORITHMEN

Title (fr)

FOUR COMBINE AVEC INTRODUCTION MANUELLE D'ALGORITHMES DE COMMANDE

Publication

EP 1062842 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00903274 A

Priority

  • US 0000840 W
  • US 11574499 P
  • US 48096200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0042824A1] A speed cooking oven includes a combination of radiant cooking units and a microwave cooking unit manually controllable using a rotary dial input selector coupled to a control panel for user selection of desired oven features. An alphanumeric display displays prompts and information to guide users through a feature selection process. A microprocessor executes a cooking algorithm based upon user defined constants entered via the rotary dial according to prompts on the alphanumeric display.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 6/68; H05B 6/80

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/02 (2006.01); F24C 7/04 (2006.01); F24C 15/00 (2006.01); H05B 6/68 (2006.01); H05B 6/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/6482 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0042824A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0042824 A1 20000720; CA 2321652 A1 20000720; CA 2321652 C 20090707; CN 1281101 C 20061018; CN 1293883 A 20010502; DE 60044596 D1 20100812; EP 1062842 A1 20001227; EP 1062842 B1 20100630; JP 2002535595 A 20021022

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161230

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170103

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20161222 AND 20161228

2017-01-03 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60044596

- Representative's name: CASALONGA & PARTNERS, DE

2016-11-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: HAILER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC., US

- Effective date: 20161006

2016-10-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC., WILMINGTON, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GENERAL ELECTRIC CO., SCHENECTADY, N.Y., US

- Document: DE 60044596

2016-10-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60044596

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

2016-10-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60044596

- Representative's name: CASALONGA & PARTNERS, DE

2016-09-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC.

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-06-16 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Document: DE 60044596

- Effective date: 20110329

2011-05-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ELECTROLUX ROTHENBURG GMBH FACTORY AND DEVELOPMENT

- Effective date: 20110329

2010-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60044596 P 20100812

2010-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2010-06-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-10-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070904

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010122

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE