Global patent index - EP 1062862 A8

EP 1062862 A8 2001-03-14 - Silage unloader-mixer-distributor

Title (en)

Silage unloader-mixer-distributor

Title (de)

Silageentnehmer, -mischer und -verteiler

Title (fr)

Désileuse-mélangeuse-distributrice

Publication

EP 1062862 A8 (FR)

Application

EP 00401777 A

Priority

FR 9908088 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1062862A1] A U shaped frame (1) has a towing connection (2) and side arms (5) which support a hydraulically rotatable cylindrical drum (3) and a cutting tool (13). The cutting tool abstracts silage under the control of a loader arm and deposits it into the drum through an orifice (6) with door (7). When the drum is full it is rotated hydraulically and an internal thread (9) first mixes and then ejects the material through a side door (10)

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01F 25/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01F 25/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01F 25/2027 (2013.01); A01F 2025/2063 (2013.01); A01F 2025/2072 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1062862 A1 20001227; EP 1062862 A8 20010314; FR 2795287 A1 20001229; FR 2795287 B1 20010803

INPADOC legal status

2004-11-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040525

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030528

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI