Global patent index - EP 1062890 A2

EP 1062890 A2 2000-12-27 - Device for treating hair

Title (en)

Device for treating hair

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Behandeln von Haaren

Title (fr)

Dispositif de traitement des cheveux

Publication

EP 1062890 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109616 A

Priority

DE 19929359 A

Abstract (en)

The hair treatment device comprises a hand spray (1) connected to a water supply and a removable container (6) or supply pipe (7). These supply hair treatment agent.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Einrichtung zum Behandeln von Haaren mit zumindest einer Handbrause (1), welche mit zumindest einem Wasseranschluss, Mischbatterie od. dgl. in Verbindung steht, soll der Handbrause (1) zum Beimischen von flüssigen und/oder pulverförmigen Mitteln zumindest ein wiederlösbares Behälterelement (6) oder eine ggf. wiederlösbare Zuführleitung (7) für das Mittel zugeordnet sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 19/02 (2006.01); B05B 7/24 (2006.01); E03C 1/046 (2006.01); A45D 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/2478 (2013.01); A45D 19/02 (2013.01); B05B 7/2454 (2013.01); E03C 1/046 (2013.01); A45D 2019/0058 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1062890 A2 20001227; EP 1062890 A3 20020116; DE 19929359 A1 20001228

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-11-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-10-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 45D 19/00 A, 7A 45D 19/02 B, 7B 05B 7/24 B, 7E 03C 1/046 B

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI