Global Patent Index - EP 1062904 A1

EP 1062904 A1 2000-12-27 - In-sink micro-machine

Title (en)

In-sink micro-machine

Title (de)

In eine Spüle eingebautes Mikrogerät

Title (fr)

Machine miniature montée dans un évier

Publication

EP 1062904 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99870126 A

Priority

EP 99870126 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention is directed to a device for semi-automatic washing of dishes and the like, to be removably plugged into the drain of a kitchen sink, characterized in that it comprises: (i) a means for circulating wash water into the sink, and (ii) a means to supply the water circulating means with power, and (iii) a set of filters (14) for purifying the wash water, and (iv) a pipe (15) system for connecting the filters to the means for circulating wash water. Optionally but preferably, the means for circulating the wash water in the sink is an electrically driven pump. Also preferably, the device further comprises a heating means for maintaining the temperature of the wash water at the same level, a means for automatically delivering a dish washing composition into the wash water, an ultrasonic wave generator for enhancing the wash process. Most preferably, the device also comprises in combination at least one sensor means and at least one chip to automatically control the sequence of the washing process. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 17/00; A47L 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/13 (2006.01); A47L 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/13 (2013.01); A47L 15/0086 (2013.01); A47L 2601/17 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1062904 A1 20001227; AU 5752000 A 20010109; WO 0078200 A2 20001228; WO 0078200 A3 20010705

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021125

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020712

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010601

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI