Global Patent Index - EP 1062916 A3

EP 1062916 A3 2001-01-31 - Process for manufacturing customized implant-mounted tooth replacements and process for making a dental prosthesis, especially of any, also biocompatible material and especially with the aid of the CAD-CAM method

Title (en)

Process for manufacturing customized implant-mounted tooth replacements and process for making a dental prosthesis, especially of any, also biocompatible material and especially with the aid of the CAD-CAM method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines individuell gefertigten, implantatgestützten Zahnersatzes und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Zahnersatzteiles, insbesondere aus beliebigen, auch biokompatiblen Werkstoffen und insbesondere mit Hilfe der CAD-CAM-Fräs- und Schleif-Technik

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication personnalisé de proheses dentaires fixées sur implants et procédé de fabrication d'une prothèse dentaire, en particulier d'une quelconque matière, aussi en matière biocompatible, en particulier à l'aide de la CAD-CAM meulage et fraisage méthode

Publication

EP 1062916 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00110016 A

Priority

CH 115199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1062916A2] The method involves applying a manipulation implant into a working model and then applying an auxiliary element which, together with the manipulation implant reproduces the position of the implant (12) in the jaw. Using a scanner, the three-dimensional geometry of the working model and auxiliary element is detected. Implant data defining the depth, inclination and relative position of the implant are determined from base data. Abutment data defining the connecting piece to be produced are determined from the implant data. The abutment is manufactured using a CAD/CAM system based on the abutment data.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61C 13/00; A61C 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61C 8/00 (2006.01); A61C 13/00 (2006.01); A61C 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61C 8/0048 (2013.01); A61C 9/004 (2013.01); A61C 13/0004 (2013.01); A61C 8/0051 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1062916 A2 20001227; EP 1062916 A3 20010131; EP 1062916 B1 20070110; EP 1062916 B2 20130918; AT 479401 T 20100915; AU 4084000 A 20010104; AU 762679 B2 20030703; CH 694571 A5 20050415; DE 50013943 D1 20070222; DE 50015982 D1 20101014; EP 1745760 A1 20070124; EP 1745760 B1 20100901; JP 2001054525 A 20010227; JP 3616311 B2 20050202; US 6788986 B1 20040907

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-02 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2013-11-07 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50013943

- Effective date: 20130918

2013-09-30 [REG CH AELC] CONTINUATION IN CHANGED FORM

2013-09-18 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20130918

2013-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2010-07-02 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2010-07-02 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2010-07-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-11-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: STRAUMANN HOLDING AG

2009-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BIEN-AIR DCS SOLUTIONS AG

- Free text: DCS DENTAL AG#GEWERBESTRASSE 24#4123 ALLSCHWILL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- BIEN-AIR DCS SOLUTIONS AG#GEWERBESTRASSE 24#4123 ALLSCHWIL (CH)

2009-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ALLNE SA

- Free text: BIEN-AIR DCS SOLUTIONS AG#GEWERBESTRASSE 24#4123 ALLSCHWIL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- ALLNE SA#C/O FROTE & PARTNER SA FAUBOURG DU LAC 11#2000 NEUCHATEL (CH)

2009-10-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BIEN-AIR DENTAL SA

- Free text: ALLNE SA#C/O FROTE & PARTNER SA FAUBOURG DU LAC 11#2000 NEUCHATEL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- BIEN-AIR DENTAL SA#LAENGGASSE 60#2502 BIENNE (CH)

2009-10-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: STRAUMANN HOLDING AG

- Free text: BIEN-AIR DENTAL SA#LAENGGASSE 60#2502 BIENNE (CH) -TRANSFER TO- STRAUMANN HOLDING AG#PETER MERIAN-WEG 12#4052 BASEL (CH)

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070512

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070110

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070512

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070411

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070110

2008-04-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BIEN-AIR DCS SOLUTIONS SA

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DCS DENTAL A.G.

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070110

2007-11-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIRONA DENTAL SYSTEMS GMBH

- Effective date: 20071010

2007-11-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENDRIKS, RALPH ARMANDO

- Effective date: 20071010

2007-08-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-08-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070110

2007-08-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-06-11 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070611

2007-05-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-04-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070421

2007-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: OK PAT AG PATENTE MARKEN LIZENZEN

2007-02-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013943 P 20070222

2007-02-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-01-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-10 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070110

2007-01-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070110

2007-01-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070110

2007-01-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070110

2006-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DCS DENTAL AG

2005-08-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050701

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010213

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61C 13/00 A, 7A 61C 5/10 B

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI