Global Patent Index - EP 1062944 A1

EP 1062944 A1 2000-12-27 - Cosmetic material

Title (en)

Cosmetic material

Title (de)

Kosmetisches Mittel

Title (fr)

Produit cosmétique

Publication

EP 1062944 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00304947 A

Priority

  • JP 16476899 A
  • JP 2000169265 A

Abstract (en)

A cosmetic material in which a silicone compound represented by the following formula (1) is mixed: R<1>aR<2>bSiO(4-a-b)/2 wherein R<1> groups, which are the same or different, each represent a hydrogen atom or an organic group selected from the class consisting of alkyl groups containing 1 to 30 carbon atoms, aryl groups, aralkyl groups, fluorinated alkyl groups and organic groups represented by the following formula (2); R<2> groups each represent a silicone group represented by the following formula (3); a is a number of from 1.0 to 2.5; b is a number of from 0.001 to 1.5; - CcH2c -O- (C2H4O)d(C3H6O)eR<3> <CHEM> wherein R<3> is a hydrocarbon group containing 4 to 30 carbon atoms, or an organic group represented by R<4>-(CO)-; R<4> is a hydrocarbon group containing 1 to 30 carbon atoms; c is an integer of from 0 to 15, d is an integer of from 0 to 50, and e is an integer of from 0 to 50; and f is an integer of from 1 to 5, and g is an integer of from 0 to 500. The silicone compounds represented by formula (1) not only have high compatibility with other ingredients of cosmetics, such as oils, surfactants and powders, to ensure high stability in the emulsified state, but also they produce an excellent effect in cleansing sebum stains and durable makeup stains.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/48; A61K 7/02; A61K 7/06; A61K 7/32; A61K 7/40; C08G 77/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/72 (2006.01); A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/02 (2006.01); A61K 8/03 (2006.01); A61K 8/06 (2006.01); A61K 8/30 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/89 (2006.01); A61K 8/891 (2006.01); A61K 8/894 (2006.01); A61K 8/896 (2006.01); A61K 8/897 (2006.01); A61K 8/898 (2006.01); A61K 8/92 (2006.01); A61Q 1/00 (2006.01); A61Q 1/02 (2006.01); A61Q 1/04 (2006.01); A61Q 1/06 (2006.01); A61Q 1/10 (2006.01); A61Q 1/12 (2006.01); A61Q 1/14 (2006.01); A61Q 5/00 (2006.01); A61Q 15/00 (2006.01); A61Q 17/04 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01); C08G 77/50 (2006.01); C08L 83/04 (2006.01); A61Q 19/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 77/50 (2013.01); A61K 8/891 (2013.01); A61K 8/897 (2013.01); A61Q 1/02 (2013.01); A61Q 1/12 (2013.01); A61Q 5/00 (2013.01); A61Q 15/00 (2013.01); A61Q 17/04 (2013.01); A61Q 19/00 (2013.01); A61Q 1/06 (2013.01); A61Q 1/10 (2013.01); A61Q 1/14 (2013.01); A61Q 19/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1062944 A1 20001227; EP 1062944 B1 20040303; DE 60008634 D1 20040408; DE 60008634 T2 20050203; JP 2001055307 A 20010227; JP 3850202 B2 20061129; US 2002058053 A1 20020516

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160607

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160608

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-12-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60008634 P 20040408

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010525

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI