Global patent index - EP 1062990 A1

EP 1062990 A1 2000-12-27 - Golf club with specific tension of the striking surface and method for making the coated surface

Title (en)

Golf club with specific tension of the striking surface and method for making the coated surface

Title (de)

Golfschläger mit spannungsspezifischer Schlagfläche und Verfahren zur Herstellung der Beschichtung

Title (fr)

Club de golf avec une surface de frappe ayant une contrainte specifique et procédé de fabrication de ce revêtement

Publication

EP 1062990 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112807 A

Priority

DE 19929116 A

Abstract (en)

Golf club has a striking surface with a coating that is under pressure or not. AN Independent claim is also included for a process for the production of a golf club comprising applying the coating to the striking surface using a spraying process, preferably flame spraying, with a particle speed of over 500 m/s.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Golfschläger mit einer Schlagfläche zum Schlagen von Golfbällen und ferner ein Verfahren zum Beschichten eines Golfschlägers zumindest im Bereich der Schlagfläche mittels eines thermischen Spritzverfahrens. Erfindungsgemäß wird zur Erhöhung der Standzeiten vorgeschlagen, daß der Golfschläger im Bereich der Schlagfläche zumindest teilweise eine Beschichtung umfaßt, die entweder spannungsneutral ausgebildet ist oder Druckspannungen aufweist. Die Beschichtung wird mittels eines thermischen Spritzverfahrens mit mitteleren Spritzpartikelgeschwindigkeiten über 500 m/s aufgebracht. Die Beschichtung weist bevorzugt Druckspannungen zwischen 0 und 600 MPa auf. Als Spritzpartikel eignen sich insbeondere Hartmetalle, Cermets und/oder Oxide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 53/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 53/04 (2006.01); A63B 59/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 24/04 (2013.01); C23C 4/12 (2013.01); A63B 53/04 (2013.01); A63B 2053/0416 (2013.01); A63B 2060/004 (2015.10); A63B 2209/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1062990 A1 20001227; DE 19929116 A1 20001228; US 6679788 B1 20040120

INPADOC legal status

2008-06-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070703

2005-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041227

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010612

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI