Global patent index - EP 1063006 A3

EP 1063006 A3 2001-02-28 - Process for mixing bulk material and mixing apparatus

Title (en)

Process for mixing bulk material and mixing apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Mischen von Schüttgut und Mischvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour mélanger des matériaux en vrac et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé de mélange

Publication

EP 1063006 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00110465 A

Priority

DE 19923156 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19923156A1] Mixing powdered granular small particulate or flaky material comprises transporting the material to a vibrating conveyor (11), removing a partial stream during further movement and conveying and recycling to the start of the conveying path (17), where the material is further conveyed with newly added material. An Independent claim is also included for a mixing device for carrying out the process. Preferred Features: The material flows through the conveying path a number of times until it reaches the prescribed degree of mixing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 11/00; B01F 3/18; B01F 5/26; B65G 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/26 (2006.01); B01F 11/00 (2006.01); B01F 3/18 (2006.01); B01F 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/26 (2013.01); B01F 11/006 (2013.01); B01F 3/18 (2013.01); B01F 5/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19923156 A1 20001123; EP 1063006 A2 20001227; EP 1063006 A3 20010228

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031202

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOETTER, THEODOR H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 01F 11/00 A, 7B 01F 5/26 B, 7B 01F 3/18 B, 7B 65G 27/02 B

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI