Global Patent Index - EP 1063017 A3

EP 1063017 A3 2001-04-04 - Seperating device, seperation unit for such a seperating device, and seperating method.

Title (en)

Seperating device, seperation unit for such a seperating device, and seperating method.

Title (de)

Trenneinrichtung, Trenneinheit für eine solche Trenneinrichtung, und Trennverfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif de séparation, unité de séparation pour un tel dispositif, et procédé de séparation

Publication

EP 1063017 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00202158 A

Priority

  • NL 1012401 A
  • NL 1014410 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1063017A2] A device for separating particles from a fluid comprises a number of separation units. Each separation unit comprises a number of elongate cyclones (7) which are arranged parallel to and next to one another. Each cyclone is provided with a feed (14e), an overflow discharge (40) and an underflow discharge (41). Each separation unit furthermore comprises a first chamber (21), into which the overflow discharges of the cyclones open out, a second chamber (20), in which the cyclones are arranged, which second chamber contains the feeds of the cyclones, and a third chamber (22), into which the underflow discharges of the cyclones open out. The chambers are substantially cylindrical and are stacked as seen in the longitudinal direction of the cyclones. The separation units are also stacked as seen in the longitudinal direction of the cyclones. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04C 5/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04C 5/24 (2006.01); B04C 5/12 (2006.01); B04C 5/14 (2006.01); B04C 5/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04C 5/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063017 A2 20001227; EP 1063017 A3 20010404; BR 0002709 A 20010130; CA 2311747 A1 20001221; CN 1278460 A 20010103; JP 2001025685 A 20010130; NL 1014410 C1 20001222

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010105

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI