Global patent index - EP 1063024 A1

EP 1063024 A1 2000-12-27 - Device for the variable adjustment of the stand centre on rolling stands

Title (en)

Device for the variable adjustment of the stand centre on rolling stands

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur verändernden Einstellung der Gerüstmitte an Walzgerüsten

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'ajustement variable le centre d'une cage dans des laminoirs

Publication

EP 1063024 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112631 A

Priority

DE 19929035 A

Abstract (en)

Device for adjusting the middle of roll stands comprises connecting side parts (ST) formed as independent structural parts with the vertical stands (VS) so that they can be adjusted using lifting devices (HE).

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zur verändernden Einstellung der Gerüstmitte an, Universalwalzgerüsten die, beidseitig, die Horizontalwalzen (HW) aufnehmende Vertikalständer (VS), aufweisen und an diesen angeordnete, nach außen kragende Seitenteile (ST) mit Führungen zur Aufnahme der Lagereinbaustücke der Vertikalwalzen (VW) und mit hydraulisch beaufschlagten, die Vertikalständer (VS) lösbar miteinander verspannenden horizontalen Zugankern (ZA). Die Seitenteile (ST) sind als selbständige Gerüstteile ausgebildet, und mit den Vertikalständern (VS), vertikal verschiebbar zu diesen verbunden und mittels, sie unterlassender Hubeinrichtungen (HE) höhenverstell- und festlegbar.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 31/18; B21B 31/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/02 (2006.01); B21B 31/18 (2006.01); B21B 13/10 (2006.01); B21B 31/04 (2006.01); B21B 31/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/02 (2013.01); B21B 31/18 (2013.01); B21B 31/04 (2013.01); B21B 31/10 (2013.01); B21B 2013/106 (2013.01); B21B 2031/023 (2013.01); B21B 2273/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063024 A1 20001227; EP 1063024 B1 20030910; AT 249289 T 20030915; DE 19929035 A1 20001228

INPADOC legal status

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050615

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040615

2004-06-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040604

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50003609

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT SE

2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT SE

2001-10-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT IT SE

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE IT SE

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000703

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI