Global Patent Index - EP 1063026 A1

EP 1063026 A1 2000-12-27 - Tool for manually straightening possibly dents located in the sheet body of motorised vehicles

Title (en)

Tool for manually straightening possibly dents located in the sheet body of motorised vehicles

Title (de)

Werkzeug zum handmässig Ausbeulen von Karrosserieteilen

Title (fr)

Outil pour le débosselage manuel des carrosseries automobiles

Publication

EP 1063026 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202028 A

Priority

EP 99202028 A

Abstract (en)

A tool (1) for manually straightening possible dents located in the sheet body of motorised vehicles, comprising a rigid body (2) having at least one end (3) adapted to be pressed against the dent to be straightened. The at least one end of the rigid body is advantageously coated with or made of a synthetic material, preferably plastic. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 1/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063026 A1 20001227

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060915

2004-01-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTEREST P. RATE LTD.

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAWTESBURY LIMITED

2003-03-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TOOL FOR MANUALLY STRAIGHTENING POSSIBLE DENTS LOCATED IN THE SHEET BODY OF MOTORISED VEHICLES

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011221

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL PT

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010528

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL PT

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI