Global patent index - EP 1063028 A1

EP 1063028 A1 2000-12-27 - Press for external hydroforming

Title (en)

Press for external hydroforming

Title (de)

Presse zum Aussenhochdruckformen

Title (fr)

Presse pour hydroformage extérieur

Publication

EP 1063028 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00111618 A

Priority

DE 19928422 A

Abstract (en)

The press has a lockable press ram (2) and plate holders (3) with cylinders (7). These are formed as short stroke cylinders. The working cylinders (6) carrying the tool (9) are integrated in the ram. Ram and plate holders are driven by a common drive cylinder (5). The short stroke cylinders are operated individually or in groups, and the rams have hydraulic couplings (16).

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Umformpresse für das Außenhochdruckumformen vorgeschlagen, bei der der Flüssigkeitskasten (10) stationär angeordnet ist. Arbeitszylinder (6) sind zur Erzielung einer kompakten Bauform im Stößel (2) intergriert und die Blechhalter- und Schließkraft wird von Kurzhubzylinder (7) aufgebracht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 22/22; B21D 22/20; B21D 24/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/20 (2006.01); B21D 22/22 (2006.01); B21D 24/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/205 (2013.01); B21D 22/22 (2013.01); B21D 24/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063028 A1 20001227; EP 1063028 B1 20011031; EP 1063028 B2 20070613; CA 2312435 A1 20001223; CA 2312435 C 20060425; DE 19928422 A1 20001228; ES 2167301 T3 20020516; ES 2167301 T5 20080116; US 6481256 B1 20021119

INPADOC legal status

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110601

2013-10-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20131029

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120131

2011-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50000026

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50000026

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100421

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100528

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100520

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100608

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

2007-11-02 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2007-06-13 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20070613

2007-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2002-07-31 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: INELTA TECHNOLOGIE GMBH

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2167301

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-04-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50000026

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-06

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010221

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI