Global Patent Index - EP 1063030 A2

EP 1063030 A2 2000-12-27 - Press device

Title (en)

Press device

Title (de)

Pressvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de pressage

Publication

EP 1063030 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99113861 A

Priority

JP 17923599 A

Abstract (en)

It is a purpose of the present invention to provide a press device of low cost comprising a sliding cam base, a sliding cam that is guided by the sliding cam base and to which processing members such as a punch are attached, an energizing body provided between the sliding cam base and the sliding cam for energizing the sliding cam, and an operating cam abutted against the sliding cam for driving the sliding cam, wherein the sliding cam can be held by the sliding cam base to enable accurate press processing free of warps or rolling. For this purpose, it has been provided for a press device of low cost comprising a sliding cam base, a sliding cam that is guided by the sliding cam base and to which processing members such as a punch are attached, an energizing body provided between the sliding cam base and the sliding cam for energizing the sliding cam, and an operating cam abutted against the sliding cam for driving the sliding cam, wherein the press device is arranged in that the sliding cam is provided in a freely slidable manner between two guide posts of circular section suspended from the sliding cam base and separated from each other by a specified distance, and wherein one surface of the sliding cam base is formed as a V-shaped groove and a surface of the sliding cam opposing this surface of the sliding cam base is formed, at the operating cam thereof, with an angular guide portion abutting the V-shape groove. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 28/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/34 (2006.01); B21D 5/01 (2006.01); B21D 28/32 (2006.01); B21D 37/08 (2006.01); B30B 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063030 A2 20001227; EP 1063030 A3 20030122; JP 2001001046 A 20010109; JP 3072095 B1 20000731

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040310

2003-10-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030527

2003-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030103

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI