Global Patent Index - EP 1063031 A2

EP 1063031 A2 2000-12-27 - Press arrangement with automatic tool changing

Title (en)

Press arrangement with automatic tool changing

Title (de)

Pressenanlage mit automatischem Werkzeugwechsel

Title (fr)

Installation de pressage avec un dispositif de changement d'outils automatique

Publication

EP 1063031 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112557 A

Priority

DE 19927824 A

Abstract (en)

Each of the magazines (51) contains a press tool (16) having operation specific workpiece holding fixtures and a control system to enable the operation to proceed or not. Tools (23) are transported on a sliding table (22) to the magazines.

Abstract (de)

Eine Pressenanlage (1) ist mit einer Transfereinrichtung (26) versehen, deren werkstückspezifischen Teile (38) durch eine eigens vorgesehene Transport- und Übergabeeinrichtung (50) zu einem Magazin (51) transportierbar sind. Das Magazin (51) ist vorzugsweise Bestandteil der Pressenanlage (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 43/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/028 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19927824 A1 20001221; BR 0004012 A 20010724; EP 1063031 A2 20001227; EP 1063031 A3 20020619

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021022

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020705

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI