Global Patent Index - EP 1063056 A2

EP 1063056 A2 2000-12-27 - Method and apparatus for measuring a pad profile and closed loop control of a pad conditioning process

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for measuring a pad profile and closed loop control of a pad conditioning process

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Messen eines Polierkissenprofils und Steuerung mit geschlossenem Regelkreis eines Polierkissen Aufbereitungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour mesurer le profil d'un tampon de polissage et commande en boucle fermée du processus de dressage d'un tampon

Publication

EP 1063056 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305242 A

Priority

US 33835799 A

Abstract (en)

A method and apparatus for enhancing the process performance over the life of a polishing pad (120) in a chemical-mechanical polishing apparatus (80) employs closed loop control of polishing pad wear. A contactless displacement sensor (175), such as a laser displacement sensor, provides feedback that is used to generate a pad profile of the polishing pad. Conditioning apparatus (130) is then controlled in response to the feedback from the laser displacement sensor in a closed loop control to modify the conditioning process and control the pad wear uniformity. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 53/007; B24B 37/04; B24B 49/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/00 (2006.01); B24B 49/12 (2006.01); B24B 53/00 (2006.01); B24B 53/007 (2006.01); B24B 53/017 (2012.01); G01B 11/06 (2006.01); H01L 21/304 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 53/017 (2013.01); B24B 49/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063056 A2 20001227; EP 1063056 A3 20030326; JP 2001129754 A 20010515; TW 466153 B 20011201

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030927

2004-01-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-12-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-01-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GARRETSON, CHARLES C.

2001-01-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BENVEGNU, DOMINIC

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI