Global Patent Index - EP 1063068 A2

EP 1063068 A2 2000-12-27 - A method for the decorative printing of surfaces, particularly of tiles and the like, and a machine devised for implementing the method of the invention

Title (en)

A method for the decorative printing of surfaces, particularly of tiles and the like, and a machine devised for implementing the method of the invention

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Bedrucken von Oberflächen mit einem Dekor, insbesondere zum Bedrucken von Fliesen, und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de revêtement décoratif de surfaces, en particulier de carreaux, et dispositif de mise en oeuvre dudit procédé

Publication

EP 1063068 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99830428 A

Priority

IT PD990132 A

Abstract (en)

A method for the decorative printing of surfaces, particularly of tiles and the like is described; the method provides for a colouring substance to be sprayed in a jet through a nozzle (7) onto a surface (2) to be decorated, and the colouring substance is transferred to the surface (2) by directing the flow of the jet by means of a mask (16) interposed between the nozzle (7) and the surface (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 11/04; B05B 15/04; B05B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/04 (2006.01); B28B 11/00 (2006.01); B28B 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 11/04 (2013.01); B05B 15/04 (2013.01); B28B 11/001 (2013.01); B28B 11/048 (2013.01); B28B 11/049 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063068 A2 20001227; EP 1063068 A3 20020130; IT 1306670 B1 20011002; IT PD990132 A1 20001222

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARKTYPE S.R.L.

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI