Global Patent Index - EP 1063083 A2

EP 1063083 A2 2000-12-27 - Bituminous roofing material

Title (en)

Bituminous roofing material

Title (de)

Bituminöse Dachabdichtungsbahn

Title (fr)

Couverture de toit bitumineuse

Publication

EP 1063083 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110649 A

Priority

DE 29911125 U

Abstract (en)

The underside (1) is a thermoplastic fleece, the next layer is bitumen (2), especially elastomeric bitumen. The supporting inlay (3) is a tensile layer of fleece or fabric. A further layer of elastomeric bitumen (4) is covered by an upper separation layer (5) with an edge strip, allowing welding with the underside of the overlapping edge strip of a similar sealing band. At the edge, a bitumen strip (6) on the upper or lower layer (1 or 5) is self-adhesive in the cold state, and is covered by a backing strip (6a, 7a).

Abstract (de)

Eine Dachabdichtungsbahn, bestehend aus einer unterseitigen Lage (1) aus einem schmelzbaren Kunststoffvlies oder einer anderen schmelzbaren Kunststoffschicht, einer ersten Lage (2) aus Bitumen, insbesondere Elastomerbitumen, einer Trägereinlage (3) aus einem zugfesten Vlies oder Gewebe, einer zweiten Lage (4) aus Bitumen, insbesondere Elastomerbitumen, einer oberseitigen Trennlage (5) mit einem Randstreifen, der der Verschweißung mit der unterseitigen Lage des überlappenden Randstreifens einer anschließenden, gleichartigen Dachabdichtungsbahn dient, einem im Randbereich mindestens der unterseitigen oder der oberseitigen Lage (1 oder 5) angeordneten, im kalten Zustand selbstklebenden Bitumenstreifen (6), der vor der Verlegung mit einer Abziehfolie (6a) abgedeckt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B32B 11/10; D06N 5/00; E04D 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06N 5/00 (2006.01); E04D 5/10 (2006.01); E04D 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 5/12 (2013.01); D06N 5/00 (2013.01); E04D 5/10 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24355 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31815 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29911125 U1 19991230; AT 300420 T 20050815; DK 1063083 T3 20051128; EP 1063083 A2 20001227; EP 1063083 A3 20011031; EP 1063083 B1 20050727; NO 20003126 A 20001227; NO 20003126 D0 20000616; NO 317700 B1 20041206; US 6360506 B1 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-24 [REG DE R100] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT UNAMENDED NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50010808

- Effective date: 20130919

2014-03-19 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20130919

2012-07-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50010808

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE HENKEL, BREUER & PARTNER, DE

2009-08-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PAUL BAUDER GMBH & CO.

2009-08-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: AWA GMBH

2009-06-10 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: PAUL BAUDER GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20060302

2009-06-10 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: AWA GMBH

- Effective date: 20060426

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060518

2006-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PAUL BAUDER GMBH & CO.

2006-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: AWA GMBH

2006-07-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PAUL BAUDER GMBH & CO.

2006-06-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PAUL BAUDER GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20060302

2006-06-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AWA GMBH

- Effective date: 20060426

2006-05-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060518

2006-04-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PAUL BAUDER GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20060302

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-11-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-09-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050905

2005-09-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010808 P 20050901

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

2005-07-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-03-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

2004-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040609

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011213

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 32B 11/10 A, 7D 06N 5/00 B, 7E 04D 5/10 B, 7E 04D 5/12 B

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI