Global Patent Index - EP 1063087 A1

EP 1063087 A1 2000-12-27 - Apparatus and method for cutting material webs

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for cutting material webs

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Schneiden von Materialbahnen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour couper des bandes de matériau

Publication

EP 1063087 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00111002 A

Priority

US 33972599 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a compressed air cylinder (28) with a first valve (21) connected to its first side (29) for applying a first defined pressure and second valve (24) connected to its second side (31). The second valve applies a pressure to the second side greater than the first pressure in a non-cutting mode; this pressure is reduced to a value below the first pressure to start the cutting process. An Independent claim is also included for a method of cutting strip material.

Abstract (de)

Eine erfindungsgemäße Vorrichtung zum Schneiden von Materialbahnen, mit einem Druckluftzylinder (28) mit einer ersten Seite (29) und einer zweiten Seite (31), einem mit der ersten Seite (29) des Druckluftzylinders (28) verbundenen ersten Ventil (21), das eine erste Seite (29) des Druckluftzylinders (28) mit einem ersten vorgegebenen Druck beaufschlagt, und einem mit der zweiten Seite (24) des Druckluftzylinders (28) verbundenen zweiten Ventil (24) zeichnet sich dadurch aus, dass das zweite Ventil (24) in einem nichtschneidenden Zustand des Druckluftzylinders (28) die zweite Seite (31) mit einem zweiten vorgegebenen Druck beaufschlagt, der größer ist als der erste vorgegebene Druck, und dass der zweite vorgegebene Druck zur Einleitung eines Schneidevorgangs am Schneidezylinder (28) auf einen Wert unter dem ersten vorgegebenen Druck reduzierbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/60; B26D 1/06; B65H 35/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 5/20 (2006.01); B26D 1/06 (2006.01); B26D 1/56 (2006.01); B26D 5/12 (2006.01); B26F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26F 3/02 (2013.01); B26D 1/065 (2013.01); B26D 5/12 (2013.01); Y10T 83/04 (2015.04); Y10T 83/8858 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063087 A1 20001227; EP 1063087 B1 20021023; DE 10026947 A1 20010222; DE 50000668 D1 20021128; JP 2001025993 A 20010130; US 6658972 B1 20031209

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50000668

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110527

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-04-23 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000668 20021128

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2002-10-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-10-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021023

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE GB IT LI

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010710

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI