Global Patent Index - EP 1063088 A1

EP 1063088 A1 2000-12-27 - Device and method for smoothing screen printing forms

Title (en)

Device and method for smoothing screen printing forms

Title (de)

Einrichtung und Verfahren zum Glätten von Siebdruckschablonen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode pour lisser des pochoirs sérigraphiques

Publication

EP 1063088 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112767 A

Priority

AT 108599 A

Abstract (en)

The smoothing appliance comprises a pressure-resistant, dimensionally stable, preferably rotary support roller (2) made of metal and preferably refined steel, for the template (1) onto which a jet of liquid is sprayed at high pressure from a nozzle unit (4). The template rests on the support, at least in the operating range of the nozzle unit.

Abstract (de)

Einrichtung und Verfahren zum Glätten von Siebdruckschablonen, insbesondere Rundschablonen, wobei auf eine auf einer druckfesten und formstabilen Auflage aufliegende Schablone (1, 1') Flüssigkeit unter hohem Druck aufgespritzt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/004 (2013.01); B41P 2235/26 (2013.01); B41P 2235/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 4224511 A1 19940127 - ALBERT ROSE ZWEIGNIEDERLASSUNG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063088 A1 20001227; EP 1063088 B1 20031203; AT 407025 B 20001127; AT A108599 A 20000415; DE 50004620 D1 20040115; US 6494136 B1 20021217

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-05-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004620 P 20040115

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT NL

2003-12-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030311

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE IT NL

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010608

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT NL

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI