Global patent index - EP 1063094 A1

EP 1063094 A1 2000-12-27 - Printer with driving mechanism by single motor for both sheet transferring mechanism and sheet cutting mechanism

Title (en)

Printer with driving mechanism by single motor for both sheet transferring mechanism and sheet cutting mechanism

Title (de)

Drucker mit Antrieb durch einen Motor, sowohl für Blattvorschub, als auch Blattschneidemechanismus

Title (fr)

Imprimante avec un seul moteur pour et le dispositif d'avance des feuilles et le dispositif de coupe de feuilles

Publication

EP 1063094 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00304893 A

Priority

JP 17673699 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided a printer (1) capable of eliminating overlapped members in a driving system to reduce its cost and at the same time capable of attaining a small-sized printer itself. A single driving motor selectively drives a sheet transferring mechanism and a sheet cutting mechanism of a printer comprised of the sheet transferring mechanism having a platen roller (2) and a roller driving gear (6) arranged at a rotating shaft of the platen roller; a printing mechanism for performing a recording on a sheet transferred by the platen roller; and the sheet cutting mechanism provided with each of a fixed blade fixed and arranged at the printer, a moveable member (12) having a movable blade (11) which can shear the sheet present between it and the fixed blade while sliding at one surface of the fixed blade and moving means for sliding the movable member in a direction of surface of the fixed blade. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 11/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/68 (2006.01); B41J 11/70 (2006.01); B41J 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 23/025 (2013.01); B41J 11/703 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063094 A1 20001227; EP 1063094 B1 20030827; DE 60004735 D1 20031002; DE 60004735 T2 20040226; JP 2001001590 A 20010109

INPADOC legal status

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090609

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090609

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2006-08-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060821

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050609

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60004735

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020715

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010428

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI