Global Patent Index - EP 1063096 A3

EP 1063096 A3 2001-03-07 - Ink jet printer for photofinishing

Title (en)

Ink jet printer for photofinishing

Title (de)

Tintenstrahldrucker für Photobehandlung

Title (fr)

Imprimante à jet d'encre pour photofinissage

Publication

EP 1063096 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00112468 A

Priority

DE 19929323 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1063096A2] An ink jet printer (10) for making photographic prints includes at least one paper supply (12, 12', 58, 58') for holding a supply of print paper and a sheet paper transport belt (30, 31) arranged to receive sheets of print paper (25) from the at least one paper supply and transport the sheets through the printer. A back printer (26) is located between the at least one paper supply and the paper transport belt for applying back prints to the print paper. A full print width color ink jet print head (36) located over a first portion of the transport belt (30) for printing an image on a paper sheet. A linear image sensor (46) located in front of the ink jet print head detects the edges of the paper sheet being transported under the print head and a controller (54) connected to the paper sensor generates a digital mask representing the area of the paper and applies the digital mask to a digital image being printed, thereby preventing overspill printing onto the belt. A paper dryer (48) is located over a second portion of the transport belt (31), the paper dryer including a source of flowing air (50) for drying the ink image on the paper. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 13/08; B41J 11/70; B41J 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/60 (2006.01); B41J 11/00 (2006.01); B41J 11/48 (2006.01); B41J 11/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/48 (2013.01); B41J 3/60 (2013.01); B41J 11/002 (2013.01); B41J 11/0065 (2013.01); B41J 11/007 (2013.01); B41J 11/008 (2013.01); B41J 11/0085 (2013.01); B41J 11/0095 (2013.01); B41J 11/706 (2013.01); B65H 2406/322 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063096 A2 20001227; EP 1063096 A3 20010307; DE 19929323 A1 20001228

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010908

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI