Global patent index - EP 1063099 A1

EP 1063099 A1 2000-12-27 - Stamp pad with rotatory lid and articulated hinge

Title (en)

Stamp pad with rotatory lid and articulated hinge

Title (de)

Stempelkissen mit rotierendem Deckel und gegliedertem Scharnier

Title (fr)

Tampon de timbre avec un couvercle rotatoire et une charnière articulée

Publication

EP 1063099 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99125654 A

Priority

  • JP 18063799 A
  • US 38730599 A

Abstract (en)

A stamp pad having a hinge plate between a body and a lid of the stamp pad. The hinge plate allows the lid to be rotated underneath the body of the stamp pad when the lid is in an open position. The hinge plate can be made of a flexible material to make installation of the lid easier and to reduce the likelihood of damaging the lid or the body after the hinge plate is installed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41K 1/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41K 1/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41K 1/54 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063099 A1 20001227

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040414

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030219

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010405

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI