Global Patent Index - EP 1063169 A1

EP 1063169 A1 2000-12-27 - Method and apparatus for wrapping a stack of goods as well as the thus obtained package unit

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for wrapping a stack of goods as well as the thus obtained package unit

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Umhüllen eines Stückgutstapels sowei eine nach dem Verfahren hergestellte Verpackungseinheit

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR ENVELOPPER UNE PILE D' OBJETS AINSI QUE L' ENSEMBLE OBTENU PAR CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1063169 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112969 A

Priority

DE 19928261 A

Abstract (en)

A hood-like section which stands proud of the stacked goods, is laid down against it. An Independent claim is included for the unit wrapping the stacked goods. At least one device (14) is included to lay down the hood section projecting from the stack (2). Preferred features: The hood section is connected to the tubular hood drawn over the stacked goods. It is welded to the tubular covering (also referred to as a hood). The hood section is connected to the covering by impulse welding. The covering is laid against the contours of the stacked goods, whilst being subjected to hot air. Lay-flat tubing is employed for wrapping (used in the sense of covering, not winding. Following wrapping, the stack is transferred, and the device laying the hood is applied, to lay it down. It is moved vertically. The wrapping is highly elastic sheet with ultimate longitudinal extension at least 50%, preferably 80%, 100%, or even better 150%. Longitudinal expansion results at least in part by stretching over the stacked goods. Transverse extension is 20% or more, preferably 50%. Further preferred details of the wrapping equipment are described, including the welding system. The pack unit, preferably on a pallet, is also claimed separately.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Umhüllen eines Stückgutstapels sowie eine damit hergestellte Verpackungseinheit. Um ein Verfahren zum Umhüllen eines Stückgutstapels, bei dem Schlauchfolie, deren Umfang geringer ist, als der des zu umhüllenden Stückgutstapels, zur Bildung einer Schlauchhaube von einem Vorrat abgezogen, geöffnet, in Längsrichtung gerefft und von der Schlauchfolie getrennt und verschlossen wird, die gereffte Schlauchhaube nachfolgend in Querrichtung gedehnt und über den Stückgutstapel gezogen wird, derart zu verbessern, daß Risse an der Verschlußstelle der Schlauchhaube vermieden und das Erscheinungsbild sowie die Brauchbarkeit der Umhüllung verbessert wird, wird mit der vorliegenden Erfindung vorgeschlagen, daß ein von der Oberseite des Stückgutstapels (2) abstehender Haubenabschnitt an die Kontur des Stückgutstapels angelegt wird. Die erfindungsgemäße Vorrichtung weist dementsprechend ein Mittel zum Anlegen (14) eines von der Oberseite des Stückgutstapels (2) abstehenden Haubenabschnittes an die Kontur des Stückgutstapels auf. Die erfindugsgemäße Verpackungseinheit weist in bekannter Weise einen Stückgutstapel sowie eine diesen umhüllende Schlauchhaube auf, die aus einem Flachschlauch, dessen Umfang geringer ist als der des zu umhüllenden Stückgutstapels, gebildet is, und hat weiterhin einen Haubenabschnitt, der mit der Schlauchhaube an der Oberseite des Stückgutstapels verbunden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/135 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063169 A1 20001227; DE 19928261 A1 20001228

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030826

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030414

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010620

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI