Global Patent Index - EP 1063175 A1

EP 1063175 A1 2000-12-27 - Packaging for liquid products equipped with a straw

Title (en)

Packaging for liquid products equipped with a straw

Title (de)

Mit einem Trinkhalm versehene Verpackung für flüssige Produkte

Title (fr)

Emballage de produits liquides pourvus d'une paille

Publication

EP 1063175 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99112245 A

Priority

EP 99112245 A

Abstract (en)

A packaging (1) for liquid products equipped with a straw (5) and comprising a container (3) and a cover (4) hermetically connected to each other is disclosed, where the straw (5) is incorporated within the packaging (1), is insulated by the cover (4) from the external environment and has its lower end always immersed in the liquid product filling the container (3,13). Preferably the container (3) and the straw (5) are produced at the same time so that the container (3) constitutes a single unit with the straw (5) and the upper end (8) of the straw (5) is positioned in a groove realised in the upper edge of the container (3) and at least partially closed by a tab (9), belonging to the cover (4), to be lifted up from the groove to allow the upper end (8) of the straw (5) to protrude from the packaging (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 77/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/283 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063175 A1 20001227

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030101

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030306

2001-11-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FAS INTERNATIONAL S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK FR GB IT

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010619

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI