Global Patent Index - EP 1063187 A1

EP 1063187 A1 2000-12-27 - Method and device for withdrawing parts of an overlapping stream

Title (en)

Method and device for withdrawing parts of an overlapping stream

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entnehmen von Schuppenstromteilen aus einem Schuppenstrom

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour retirer des parties d'un courant de produits en formation imbriquée

Publication

EP 1063187 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810500 A

Priority

CH 116199 A

Abstract (en)

The method for removing individual items from a group of overlapping flat items (2) on a conveyor (F.1) uses a deactivating device (3) which unfastens gripping components (1.2) on the first conveyor. A switching device moves the items in the group on to a second conveyor (F.2) while the unselected items continue along the first conveyor. An Independent claim is included for a device for carrying out the above method.

Abstract (de)

Aus einem Schuppenstrom (2), der von einem ersten Fördermittel (1) gehalten auf einem ersten Förderweg (F.1) durch einen Entnahmebereich (A) gefördert wird, wird am Eingang eines Entnahmebereichs (A) für Schuppenstromteile, die aus dem Schuppenstrom entnommen werden sollen oder aus denen Gegenstände entnommen werden sollen, die gehaltene Förderung desaktiviert und werden zu entnehmende Gegenstände durch ein für eine Entnahme einstellbares, zweites Fördermittel (5) vom ersten Förderweg (F.1) auf einen zweiten Förderweg (F.2) gefördert, während für andere Schuppenstromteile (2.1) auch bei der Förderung durch den Entnahmebereich (A) die gehaltene Förderung unverändert aufrechterhalten bleibt. Das erste Fördermittel (1) weist beispielsweise an den Längskanten des Schuppenstromes (2) angreifende Klemmorgane (1.2) auf, die am Eingang des Entnahmebereiches (A) selektiv geöffnet werden. Das zweite Fördermittel (5) weist beispielsweise ein verschwenkbares Förderband (5.2) auf, auf dem aus der gehaltenen Förderung entlassene Schuppenstromteile (2.2) lose aufliegend auf den zweiten Förderweg (F.2) gefördert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/24; B65H 29/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/00 (2006.01); B41F 21/08 (2006.01); B65G 17/26 (2006.01); B65G 47/22 (2006.01); B65H 5/24 (2006.01); B65H 29/04 (2006.01); B65H 29/60 (2006.01); B65H 29/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/66 (2013.01); B65H 29/005 (2013.01); B65H 29/60 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063187 A1 20001227; EP 1063187 B1 20030924; AT 250544 T 20031015; AU 4086100 A 20010104; AU 773716 B2 20040603; CA 2312181 A1 20001223; CA 2312181 C 20070515; DE 50003795 D1 20031030; DK 1063187 T3 20040119; JP 2001048396 A 20010220; RU 2252185 C2 20050520; US 6401903 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50003795

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50003795

2014-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130608

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130608

2014-02-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-02-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130609

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130620

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120621

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20120620

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040224

2005-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FERAG AG

- Free text: FERAG AG#ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- FERAG AG#PATENTABTEILUNG Z. H. MARKUS FELIX ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH)

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FERAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-10-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040608

2004-06-08 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040608

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-01-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-01-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-01-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040104

2003-12-24 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031224

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031110

2003-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003795 P 20031030

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-24 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-09-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-09-24 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-09-24 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-09-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-09-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-05-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR WITHDRAWING PARTS OF AN OVERLAPPING STREAM

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021105

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010601

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI