Global Patent Index - EP 1063192 A2

EP 1063192 A2 2000-12-27 - Device for controlling the blowing elements in the delivery device of a printing machine

Title (en)

Device for controlling the blowing elements in the delivery device of a printing machine

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Steuerung der Blaselemente am Ausleger einer Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour contrôler les éléments soufflants dans le dispositif de sortie d'une machine à imprimer

Publication

EP 1063192 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112934 A

Priority

DE 29911172 U

Abstract (en)

The control unit(8) constructed only for the triggering of the blowing elements is connected separately to each actuating component(901-933) of a blowing element. By operating a selector element of an input element(15) connected to the control unit one or more blowing elements are selected, and then by means of a set point adjuster a common set point is fixed for the actuating components of the selected blowing elements.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Einrichtung zur Steuerung der Blaselemente am Ausleger einer Druckmaschine, insbesondere einer Bogenoffsetdruckmaschine, bei welcher die Stellglieder der Blaselemente von einer Steuereinheit in Abhängigkeit einer Sollwertvorgabe ansteuerbar sind. Um die Einstellbarkeit der Blaselemente so flexibel wie möglich zu gestalten und gleichzeitig eine gute Übersicht und Handhabbarkeit zu gewährleisten, ist die Steuereinheit (8) zur Ansteuerung der Blaselemente (7n) einzeln mit jedem ein Blaselement (7n) antreibenden Stellglied (901...933) verbunden, wobei durch Betätigung eines Auswahlelementes (Mn, Fm) einer mit der Steuereinheit (8) verbundenen Eingabeeinheit (15) ein oder mehrere Blaselemente (7n) beliebig auswählbar sind und anschließend mittels eines Sollwerteinstellelementes (25, 26; 43, 44) den Stellgliedern (901 ... 933) den so ausgewählten Blaselemente (7n) ein gemeinsamer Sollwert vorgebbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/70 (2006.01); B41F 33/02 (2006.01); B65H 29/24 (2006.01); B65H 31/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/247 (2013.01); B65H 2515/212 (2013.01); B65H 2551/15 (2013.01); B65H 2551/18 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2515/212 + B65H 2220/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29911172 U1 19990826; EP 1063192 A2 20001227; EP 1063192 A3 20020605; JP 2001030469 A 20010206; JP 3281359 B2 20020513

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20030915

2003-02-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-07-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020426

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI