Global Patent Index - EP 1063256 A1

EP 1063256 A1 2000-12-27 - MICROPOROUS FILM

Title (en)

MICROPOROUS FILM

Title (de)

MIKROPORÖSER FILM

Title (fr)

FILM MICROPOREUX

Publication

EP 1063256 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99907942 A

Priority

  • JP 9901265 W
  • JP 6576598 A

Abstract (en)

A microporous membrane is produced by cooling a solution comprising a vinylidene fluoride homopolymer or copolymer having a weight average molecular weight of 1 x 10<5> or more and a solvent therefor, to form a two-phase gel, said microporous membrane comprising a polymer phase comprising said vinylidene fluoride homopolymer or copolymer, and intercommunicating voids which have an average pore size measured by the half-dry method of 0.005 to 5 mu m and range from one side of the membrane to the other side, and said microporous membrane having as its internal structure a percolation structure in which the polymer phase forms an isotropic network structure by three-dimensional branching in arbitrary directions, the voids are formed by surrounding by said polymer phase of the network structure and intercommunicate with one another, and the ratio of the maximum pore size measured by the bubble point method to the average pore size measured by the half-dry method is 2.0 or less. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08J 9/28; B01D 71/34; C08J 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 67/00 (2006.01); B01D 69/02 (2006.01); B01D 71/34 (2006.01); C08J 9/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 67/0086 (2013.01); B01D 67/0011 (2013.01); B01D 67/0016 (2013.01); B01D 67/0027 (2013.01); B01D 67/003 (2013.01); B01D 69/02 (2013.01); B01D 71/34 (2013.01); C08J 9/28 (2013.01); B01D 2323/12 (2013.01); B01D 2323/34 (2013.01); C08J 2201/052 (2013.01); C08J 2327/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063256 A1 20001227; EP 1063256 A4 20030326; AU 2748099 A 19991011; AU 738323 B2 20010913; CA 2322855 A1 19990923; WO 9947593 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040521

2003-03-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030206

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08J 9/28 A

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08J 9/00 B

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01D 71/34 B

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01D 67/00 B

2001-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASAHI KASEI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL