Global Patent Index - EP 1063277 A2

EP 1063277 A2 2000-12-27 - Fuel briquetting composition and the manufacturing of fuel briquettes using it

Title (en)

Fuel briquetting composition and the manufacturing of fuel briquettes using it

Title (de)

Brennstoffbrikettierungszusammensetzung und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Brenstoffbriketten mittels dieser

Title (fr)

Composition de briquetage de combustibles et procédé de préparation en l' utilisant

Publication

EP 1063277 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305291 A

Priority

GB 9914537 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel briquetting composition comprising a mixture of fuel particles, e.g., coal or petroleum coke, an alkaline phenol-formaldehyde resin, an esterified phenol-formaldehyde resole resin, a water-activatable green strength additive and water. Fuel briquettes can be made using this mixture by forming it into briquettes and allowing the resinous components of the mixture to react with the result of hardening the briquettes. <??>The use of an esterified phenol-formaldehyde resole resin as the curing agent for the alkaline phenol-formaldehyde resin binder has the advantage that the reaction product does not result in the incorporation of unreactive by-products into the polymer matrix which would, if present, lower the water resistance of the product.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10L 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 5/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063277 A2 20001227; EP 1063277 A3 20031203; GB 9914537 D0 19990825

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050219

2004-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-08-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040522

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI