Global Patent Index - EP 1063281 A2

EP 1063281 A2 2000-12-27 - Rinse aid composition and method for using the same

Title (en)

Rinse aid composition and method for using the same

Title (de)

Klarspüler und Verfahren zu dessen Verwendung

Title (fr)

Agent de rinçage et procédé d'utilisation dudit agent de rinçage

Publication

EP 1063281 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00202034 A

Priority

US 34401399 A

Abstract (en)

A rinse aid composition that does not inhibit starch breakdown and a cleaning system using the same is described. The rinse aid composition comprises a surfactant which when contacted with a gelled azure starch that is subsequently retrograded and suspended in a detergent wash having a compound capable of causing starch degradation, does not prevent at least about 75% degradation of the suspended azure starch present in the detergent wash or the rinse aid composition does not result in a washed ceramic tile coated with a potato starch from displaying a % DELTA R of greater than about 24, or both.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/02; C11D 1/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/22 (2006.01); C11D 1/24 (2006.01); C11D 1/29 (2006.01); C11D 1/52 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 11/0023 (2013.01); C11D 1/22 (2013.01); C11D 1/24 (2013.01); C11D 1/29 (2013.01); C11D 1/525 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/667 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063281 A2 20001227; EP 1063281 A3 20040121

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-13 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050214

2004-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041014

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040503

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-10-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOHNSONDIVERSEY, INC.

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI