Global Patent Index - EP 1063323 A2

EP 1063323 A2 2000-12-27 - Process for coating a work piece with a lubricant

Title (en)

Process for coating a work piece with a lubricant

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Beschichtung eines Werkstückes mit einem Schmierstoff

Title (fr)

Procédé de revêtement d'une piece avec un lubrifiant

Publication

EP 1063323 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104754 A

Priority

DE 19929090 A

Abstract (en)

Process for coating a workpiece (1) with a lubricant (3) based on molybdenum disulfide comprises cleaning and activating the workpiece before coating, placing in a chromium plating bath to form a hard chromium coating (2) with a hardness of at least 600 HV and a pearl- or column-like structure surface (2a), and then applying the lubricant (3). Preferred Features: The lubricant is applied in the recesses of the pearl- or column-like structure surface. The lubricant is mixed with a carrier liquid, and applied as a liquid by spraying. The carrier liquid contains an ester, butyl acetate and optionally an inorganic binder.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zur Beschichtung eines Werkstückes mit einem Schmierstoff auf Molybdändisulfid-Basis. Dabei wird das Werkstück vor der Beschichtung einem galvanischen Verchromungsbad ausgesetzt, damit sich ein Hartchrom-Überzug einer Härte von zumindest 600 HV mit perl- oder säulenstrukturartiger Oberfläche bildet. Diese strukturierte Oberfläche wird anschließend durch den Schmierstoff auf Molybdändisulfid-Basis ausgefüllt und geglättet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 5/48; C25D 3/04; C25D 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/24 (2006.01); B05D 3/10 (2006.01); C10M 103/04 (2006.01); C10M 103/06 (2006.01); C25D 3/04 (2006.01); C25D 5/48 (2006.01); C25D 7/00 (2006.01); C25D 7/10 (2006.01); C10N 10/02 (2006.01); C10N 10/08 (2006.01); C10N 10/12 (2006.01); C10N 10/16 (2006.01); C10N 50/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 7/10 (2013.01); C25D 3/04 (2013.01); C25D 5/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063323 A2 20001227; EP 1063323 A3 20040107; DE 19929090 A1 20001228; JP 2001046964 A 20010220; US 6355366 B1 20020312

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI